NC H402 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on July 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-18 - Ch. SL 2013-292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
TRICARE Supplement for Flex Accounts
Title
TRICARE Supplement for Flex Accounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - A1 Jeter Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - A1 Jeter Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-18 | Ch. SL 2013-292 | |
2013-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2013 | |
2013-07-11 | Pres. To Gov. 7/11/2013 | |
2013-07-10 | Ratified | |
2013-07-09 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-09 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2013-07-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2013 |
2013-07-08 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-07-03 | House | Rec To Concur S Com Sub |
2013-07-03 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/02/2013 |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Held in Senate Clerk's Office |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-07 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013 |
2013-05-02 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2013 |
2013-05-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2013-04-17 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Appropriations |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S395 (Same As) 2013-03-25 - Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging