NC H409 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Guilford Tech. May Lease Property
Title
Guilford Tech. May Lease Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Ch. SL 2011-153 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-08 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-21 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-04-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-21 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-03-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Filed |