NC H417 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
The Sergeant Mickey Hutchens Act
Title
The Sergeant Mickey Hutchens Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Zenger [R] | Rep. Erin Pare [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-22 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2021-04-22 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2021-04-22 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-03-30 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-29 | House | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S381 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Boards
Cje & Training Standards Comn.
Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Education
Employment
Government Employees
Higher Education
Inmates
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Licensing & Certification
Named Laws
Occupations
Parole & Probation
Public
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
Sentencing
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
State Employees
Teachers
Tsers
Tsers Board
Cje & Training Standards Comn.
Commissions
Correctional Institutions
Education
Employment
Government Employees
Higher Education
Inmates
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Licensing & Certification
Named Laws
Occupations
Parole & Probation
Public
Retirement
Salaries & Benefits
Sentencing
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
State Employees
Teachers
Tsers
Tsers Board
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
128 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
128 | 26 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
135 | 4 | (n/a) | Citation Text |