NC H425 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Increase and Expand Assault on/Resist of LEO

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase and Expand Assault on/Resist of LEO

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-29HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-26HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-25HousePlaced On Cal For 04/26/2019
2019-04-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-25HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-21HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback