NC H442 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-24 - Failed 2nd Reading
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-24 - Failed 2nd Reading
Summary
Parental Involvement in School Discipline.
Title
Parental Involvement in School Discipline.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-24 | Failed 2nd Reading | |
2009-06-24 | Amend Adopted #3 | |
2009-06-24 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-06-24 | Amendment Withdrawn #1 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-06-11 | Amend Pending #1 | |
2009-06-10 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-28 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-04-28 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-23 | Placed On Cal For 4/27/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-13 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-04-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-11 | Serial Referral from Jud. II to Jud. I | |
2009-03-09 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-03-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H442 |