NC H461 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Ch. SL 2021-112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-23 - Ch. SL 2021-112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
State Auditor Clarifying Amendments
Title
State Auditor Clarifying Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-11 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 69 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-04 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-04 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-23 | Ch. SL 2021-112 | |
2021-08-23 | Signed by Gov. 8/23/2021 | |
2021-08-13 | Pres. To Gov. 8/13/2021 | |
2021-08-12 | Ratified | |
2021-08-11 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-08-11 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2021-08-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-08-11 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-08-09 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-08-09 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-04 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-08-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-01 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Accounting
Auditing & Audits
Chaptered
Council Of State
Investigations
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Records
State Auditor
Auditing & Audits
Chaptered
Council Of State
Investigations
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Records
State Auditor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
147 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
147 | 64.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 64.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 64.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 64.7B | (n/a) | Citation Text |