NC H471 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State Auditor/Info. Systems/Corrective Action
Title
State Auditor/Info. Systems/Corrective Action
Sponsors
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. Jennifer Balkcom [R] | Rep. Kevin Crutchfield [R] |
Rep. Frank Sossamon [R] | Rep. Bill Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-27 | House | Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Auditing & Audits
Boards
Council Of State
Data & Records Systems
Employment
Information Technology
Licensing & Certification
Occupations
Public
Public Officials
Records
State Auditor
Stem
Boards
Council Of State
Data & Records Systems
Employment
Information Technology
Licensing & Certification
Occupations
Public
Public Officials
Records
State Auditor
Stem
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
147 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
147 | 64.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 64.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 64.6E | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
147 | 64.7A | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
93B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
93B | 4 | (n/a) | Citation Text |