NC H477 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-13 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-13 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
LEO Privacy Protection
Title
LEO Privacy Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - A1 Malone Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - A1 Malone Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S516 (Same As) 2015-03-30 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II