NC H526 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Ch. SL 2015-257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Ch. SL 2015-257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stanfield Annexation/Locust Deannexation
Title
Stanfield Annexation/Locust Deannexation
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Burr [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-30 - House - C RPT Adoption Third Reading (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - C RPT Adoption Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - C RPT Adoption Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - House - M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 104 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | Ch. SL 2015-257 | |
2015-09-30 | Ratified | |
2015-09-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-30 | House | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2015-09-29 | House | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-09-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-09-29 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-09-29 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-09-29 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2015-09-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-09-29 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-09-28 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-09-28 | House | Ruled Material |
2015-09-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-09-28 | Engrossed | |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/24/2015 |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Constitutes 1st Reading |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Amends Ruled Material |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-06-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/10/2015 |
2015-06-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-05-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Filed |