NC H531 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance
Summary
Affordable Housing for Teachers/Edgecombe Co.
Title
Affordable Housing for Teachers/Edgecombe Co.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-13 | Postponed To 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Placed On Cal For 4/9/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-03-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Assigned To Education Subcommittee on Pre-School, Elementary and Secondary Education | |
2009-03-12 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S498 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-270
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H531 |