NC H537 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Alt. Hwy Use Tax Vehicle Subscriptions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alt. Hwy Use Tax Vehicle Subscriptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-24HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-06-21HousePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2019
2019-06-21HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-06-20HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-06-20SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-06-19SenateEngrossed
2019-06-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-19SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-13SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-13SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-05SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-05SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-29SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-16HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-04-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-09HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-09HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-03HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S557 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback