NC H539 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - Re-ref Com On Education - K-12
Pending: House Education - K-12 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - Re-ref Com On Education - K-12
Pending: House Education - K-12 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Charter School Funding
Title
Charter School Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 14 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 14 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-09-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - K-12 |
2016-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-09-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-09-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-09-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/29/2015 |
2015-09-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-09-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-09-28 | Engrossed | |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Amend Failed A3 |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Amend Failed A2 |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/28/2015 |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/24/2015 |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/23/2015 |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-09-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - K-12 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary IV, if favorable, Education - K-12 |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Filed |