NC H545 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Ch. SL 2011-113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Ch. SL 2011-113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Moore County Occupancy Tax
Title
Amend Moore County Occupancy Tax
Sponsors
Rep. James Boles [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Ch. SL 2011-113 | |
2011-06-09 | Ratified | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-26 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-04-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-25 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-20 | Placed On Cal For 4/21/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-12 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-04-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-31 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-30 | Filed |