NC H553 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Ch. SL 2013-223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Carteret Co. Occupancy Tax
Title
Amend Carteret Co. Occupancy Tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Ch. SL 2013-223 | |
2013-06-27 | Ratified | |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2013 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-06-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-29 | House | Postponed To 06/03/2013 |
2013-05-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/29/2013 |
2013-05-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-06 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed |