NC H553 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ordinances Regulating Animals
Title
Ordinances Regulating Animals
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McGrady [R] | Rep. James Whitmire [R] | Rep. James Langdon [R] | Rep. James Dixon [R] |
Rep. John Ager [D] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Susan Fisher [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] |
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-30 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 88 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | Ch. SL 2015-192 | |
2015-08-05 | Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015 | |
2015-08-04 | Pres. To Gov. 8/4/2015 | |
2015-08-03 | Ratified | |
2015-07-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-30 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-07-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/30/2015 |
2015-07-29 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-07-28 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/27/2015 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-06 | House | Ref To Com On Agriculture |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Filed |