NC H557 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempt Rowan County/Local Match/HCCBG Funds
Title
Exempt Rowan County/Local Match/HCCBG Funds
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Steen [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-07-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-19 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-05-19 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-31 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-30 | Filed |