NC H564 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Ch. SL 2009-297
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Ch. SL 2009-297
Summary
Wilson County Occupancy Tax Modification.
Title
Wilson County Occupancy Tax Modification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | Ch. SL 2009-297 | |
2009-07-16 | Ratified | |
2009-07-16 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-07-14 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-27 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-05-27 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-26 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-21 | Placed On Cal For 5/26/2009 | |
2009-05-21 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-21 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed On Cal For 5/21/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-18 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-03-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-12 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H564 |