NC H566 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Private Protective Services Changes
Title
Private Protective Services Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - A2 Hastings Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - A1 Hardister Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - A2 Hastings Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - A1 Hardister Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-06-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-06-27 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, Finance |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S634 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate