NC H571 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on August 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-10 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-10 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Implement Clean Power Plan
Title
Implement Clean Power Plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 84 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 84 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-08-06 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-08-05 | Engrossed | |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/05/2015 |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/04/2015 |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/20/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-06 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Filed |