NC H575 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Establish Birth Center Licensure Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish Birth Center Licensure Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-07-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-07-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-09HousePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08HousePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-08HouseReptd Fav
2019-06-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-26HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-04HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S633 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback