NC H609 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Ch. SL 2019-208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Salary Increases/Adult Correctional Employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Salary Increases/Adult Correctional Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - A1 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30 Ch. SL 2019-208
2019-08-30 Signed by Gov. 8/30/2019
2019-08-28 Pres. To Gov. 8/28/2019
2019-08-28 Ratified
2019-08-28HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-28HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-08-27HousePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2019
2019-08-27HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-08-27HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-08-27SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-08-26SenateEngrossed
2019-08-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-26SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-22SenateReptd Fav
2019-08-21SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-08-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-08-20SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-16HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-04-16HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-04-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-08HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H609
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H609v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H609v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H609v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H609v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H609v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H609v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H609v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/184
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/183
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/182
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/562
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/563
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/793

Bill Comments

feedback