NC H626 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Realistic Evaluation of Actuarial Liabilities
Title
Realistic Evaluation of Actuarial Liabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Filed |