NC H629 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Ch. SL 2019-130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Law Enforcement Mutual Aid

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Mutual Aid

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-08 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19 Ch. SL 2019-130
2019-07-19 Signed by Gov. 7/19/2019
2019-07-10 Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2019
2019-07-09 Ratified
2019-07-08HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-08HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-04HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-04HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-02HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-02SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-07-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/01/2019
2019-06-27SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-04SenateRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-06-04SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-04SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-29SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-29SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-30SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-30SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-30SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-30HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-29HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-29HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-26HousePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-26HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-15HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-09HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-08HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback