NC H651 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appraisal Bd. Recordkeeping & Bkgrd. Checks
Title
Appraisal Bd. Recordkeeping & Bkgrd. Checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 69 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - A1 Brawley Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 95 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - A1 Brawley Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 95 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | Ch. SL 2015-200 | |
2015-08-05 | Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015 | |
2015-07-31 | Pres. To Gov. 7/31/2015 | |
2015-07-30 | Ratified | |
2015-07-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-07-29 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-07-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-07-28 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-07-27 | Engrossed | |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2015-04-28 | House | Postponed To 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-14 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-13 | House | Filed |