NC H658 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Deploy Child Welfare & Aging Component/NCFAST
Title
Deploy Child Welfare & Aging Component/NCFAST
Sponsors
Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Carla Cunningham [D] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Susan Fisher [D] |
Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Carolyn Logan [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Rep. Ben Moss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-04-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Families, Children, and Aging Policy, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S463 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate