NC H693 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Repossession of Manufactured Sign
Title
Repossession of Manufactured Sign
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Crutchfield [R] | Rep. Jarrod Lowery [R] | Rep. Steve Tyson [R] | Rep. Jennifer Balkcom [R] |
Rep. Celeste Cairns [R] | Rep. Ya Liu [D] | Rep. Joe Pike [R] | Rep. Timothy Reeder [R] |
Rep. Bill Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2023-05-02 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
25 | 2-703.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |