NC H707 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Ch. SL 2012-18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-11 - Ch. SL 2012-18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Register of Deeds/Directed Trustees/Estates
Title
Register of Deeds/Directed Trustees/Estates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-06 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Ch. SL 2012-18 | |
2012-06-11 | Signed By Gov. 6/11/2012 | |
2012-06-08 | Pres. To Gov. 6/8/2012 | |
2012-06-07 | Ratified | |
2012-06-06 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-05 | Placed On Cal For 6/6/2012 | |
2012-06-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-05 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-06-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-03 | Placed On Cal For 6/3/2011 | |
2011-06-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-03 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Banking | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |