NC H713 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-10 - Postponed To 5/12/2010
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-10 - Postponed To 5/12/2010
Summary
Expand Film Credit.
Title
Expand Film Credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Postponed To 5/12/2010 | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-08-06 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-19 | Held by Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-23 | Ref To Com On Environment and Natural Resources | |
2009-03-23 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S836 (Same As) 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-179
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H713 |