NC H719 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Ch. SL 2011-407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Ch. SL 2011-407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus Local Election Laws
Title
Omnibus Local Election Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-07-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 63 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-07-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-28 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Motion 11\SUSPEND RULES (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-28 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-27 - Senate - Motion 11\SUSPEND RULES (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | Ch. SL 2011-407 | |
2011-07-28 | Ratified | |
2011-07-28 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2011-07-28 | Placed On Cal For 7/28/2011 | |
2011-07-28 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-07-28 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2011-07-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-07-28 | Amend Failed 5 | |
2011-07-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-07-27 | Amend Failed 4 | |
2011-07-27 | Amend Failed 3 | |
2011-07-27 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2011-07-27 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-07-27 | Placed On Cal For 7/27/2011 | |
2011-07-27 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-07-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-27 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-04-27 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-27 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-21 | Placed On Cal For 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |