NC H732 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study Tort Reform
Title
Study Tort Reform
Sponsors
Rep. John Blust [R] | Rep. Larry Brown [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Collins [R] | Sen. William Cook [R] |
Rep. Leo Daughtry [R] | Rep. Earl Jones [D] | Sen. Timothy Moffitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-12 | Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |