NC H76 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Ref To Com On Finance
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-15 - Ref To Com On Finance
Summary
School Board Candidate Filing Fee.
Title
School Board Candidate Filing Fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-13 | Postponed To 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Placed On Cal For 4/9/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-08 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-01 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-09 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-05 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H76 |