NC H762 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Landowner Protection Act
Title
Landowner Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - A2 Faison\Second Reading (Y: 21 N: 91 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-05-24 - House - A1 Faison\Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - A2 Faison\Second Reading (Y: 21 N: 91 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2011-05-24 - House - A1 Faison\Second Reading (Y: 75 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-231 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2011-06-13 | Postponed To 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-09 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-05-25 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-25 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-24 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-05-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-24 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2011-05-24 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-05-19 | Postponed To 5/24/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed On Cal For 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-18 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Agriculture | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S374 (Same As) 2011-05-12 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary I