NC H772 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-06 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-06 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study SORNA Compliance
Title
Study SORNA Compliance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-06-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-02 | Placed On Cal For 6/3/2011 | |
2011-06-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-26 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-04-26 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-12 | Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee C | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Judiciary | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Fav. For Introduction | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |