NC H773 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-18 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-18 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Studies Act of 2011
Title
Studies Act of 2011
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-18 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-18 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2011-06-18 | Failed concur in SCS as Amended | |
2011-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-18 | Rec To Concur in S/Com Sub As Amended 1,2,3,4,5,6 | |
2011-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-17 | Amend Adopted 6 | |
2011-06-17 | Amend Adopted 5 | |
2011-06-17 | Amend Adopted 4 | |
2011-06-17 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2011-06-17 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-17 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-08 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-06 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-07 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-06 | Fav. For Introduction | |
2011-04-06 | Filed |