NC H780 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Ch. SL 2009-245
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Ch. SL 2009-245
Summary
Building Code/Exempt Equestrian Arenas.
Title
Building Code/Exempt Equestrian Arenas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Ch. SL 2009-245 | |
2009-06-30 | Signed By Gov. 6/30/2009 | |
2009-06-26 | Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2009 | |
2009-06-25 | Ratified | |
2009-06-24 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2009 | |
2009-06-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-23 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2009-06-18 | Ref To Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-06-18 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-15 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-05-12 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Placed On Cal For 5/11/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-16 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-26 | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-03-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H780 |