NC H805 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-01 - Ch. SL 2016-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-01 - Ch. SL 2016-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Measurability Assessments/Budget Tech. Corr
Title
Measurability Assessments/Budget Tech. Corr
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 89 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | Ch. SL 2016-123 | |
2016-08-01 | Became Law W/o Signature | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-07-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-07-01 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/01/2016 |
2016-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-30 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-30 | Engrossed | |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A3 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-09-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-09-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-09-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-09-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-09-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-08-13 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-08-13 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-08 | House | Serial Referral To Appropriations Added |
2015-04-15 | House | Ref To Com On Regulatory Reform |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-14 | House | Filed |