NC H814 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Serial Referral To Finance Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Serial Referral To Finance Added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Planned Community Act Changes
Title
Planned Community Act Changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2017-04-20 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Stricken |
2017-04-19 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2017-04-13 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary III |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | House | Filed |