NC H863 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Qualifications for Sheriff/Expunctions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualifications for Sheriff/Expunctions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-23 - House - M8 Re-Refer Rules, Cal., & Operations of the House Second Reading (Y: 62 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-23HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-23HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-22HousePlaced On Cal For 07/23/2019
2019-07-22HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-22HouseReptd Fav
2019-07-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-07-11HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-07-10HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-07-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-22HouseRef to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-22HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback