NC H878 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-15 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-15 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools for the Deaf/Administration
Title
Schools for the Deaf/Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local Government
Management
Public
Public Instruction Dept.
Secondary Education
State Board Of
Dhhs
Disabled Persons
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local Government
Management
Public
Public Instruction Dept.
Secondary Education
State Board Of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 105.51 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.13 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.31 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.32 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.33 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.34 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.35 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 150.36 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
146 | 30 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |