NC H901 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-07 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
Summary
Honors Courses in Healthful Living Classes.
Title
Honors Courses in Healthful Living Classes.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Paul Luebke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2009-05-07 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-04 | Placed On Cal For 5/5/2009 | |
2009-05-04 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-04 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned To Education Subcommittee on Pre-School, Elementary and Secondary Education | |
2009-04-13 | Re-ref Com On Education | |
2009-04-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-31 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Education | |
2009-03-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H901 |