NC H943 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Ch. SL 2012-54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-21 - Ch. SL 2012-54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Davidson County Annexations
Title
Davidson County Annexations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Ch. SL 2012-54 | |
2012-06-21 | Ratified | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-20 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-19 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-12 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-12 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-11 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/11/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2012-05-31 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-05-31 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2012-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-16 | Filed |