NC H944 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-17 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Rev. Billy Graham for Postage Stamp
Title
Rev. Billy Graham for Postage Stamp
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-17 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-17 | House | Adopted |
2015-09-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/17/2015 |
2015-09-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-15 | House | Reptd Fav For Adoption |
2015-08-10 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-08-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-08-06 | House | Filed |
2015-08-06 | House | Reptd Fav. For Introduction |