NC H982 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Ch. Res 2016-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Ch. Res 2016-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Confirm Robert Schurmeier/SBI Director
Title
Confirm Robert Schurmeier/SBI Director
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Ch. Res 2016-4 | |
2016-05-05 | Ratified | |
2016-05-04 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-05-04 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-05-04 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2016-04-28 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-04-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-04-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-04-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/28/2016 |
2016-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-04-27 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-04-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-26 | House | Filed |