NC H990 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid Hospital Assessments Adjustments
Title
Medicaid Hospital Assessments Adjustments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-17 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2022-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2022-05-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Dhhs
Health
Health Services
Hospitals
Insurance
Medicaid
Poverty
Public
Session Laws
Social Services
Title Change
Health
Health Services
Hospitals
Insurance
Medicaid
Poverty
Public
Session Laws
Social Services
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
108A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
108A | 146.12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
108A | 146.13 | (n/a) | Citation Text |