NC H991 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-04 - Ch. SL 2009-402
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-04 - Ch. SL 2009-402
Summary
Montgomery County Debt Collection/Water.
Title
Montgomery County Debt Collection/Water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-04 | Ch. SL 2009-402 | |
2009-08-04 | Ratified | |
2009-08-03 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-03 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-07-30 | Placed On Cal For 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-07-30 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-30 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-30 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2009-07-29 | Placed On Cal For 7/30/2009 | |
2009-07-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-29 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2009-07-20 | Ref To Com On Local Government I | |
2009-07-20 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-07-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-14 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-14 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-05 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-05-05 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed On Cal For 5/4/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-02 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H991 |