NC H995 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-26 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Motions for Appropriate Relief
Title
Motions for Appropriate Relief
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. Duane Hall [D] | Rep. Patricia Cotham [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Rep. Darren Jackson [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2016-05-11 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2016-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-05-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-05-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-04-28 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary III |
2016-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S850 (Same As) 2016-05-11 - Ref To Com On Judiciary II