NC S105 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ch. SL 2017-76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ch. SL 2017-76
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fairmont Vol. Annex.; Troutman Land Use Reg
Title
Fairmont Vol. Annex.; Troutman Land Use Reg
Sponsors
Sen. Danny Britt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - For Concurrence Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Ch. SL 2017-76 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Concurred On 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Concurred On 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017 |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2017-06-27 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-22 | House | Ruled Material |
2017-06-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-06-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-13 | House | Serial Referral To Finance Added |
2017-06-01 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II |
2017-06-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-17 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-05-16 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Re-ref Com On Finance