NC S1108 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-23 - Ch. Res 2009-28
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-23 - Ch. Res 2009-28
Summary
4-H Program 100th Anniversary.
Title
4-H Program 100th Anniversary.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-23 | Ch. Res 2009-28 | |
2009-07-23 | Ratified | |
2009-07-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-22 | Cal For Immediate Consid | |
2009-07-22 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2009-07-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-07-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-21 | Placed On Cal For 7/22/2009 | |
2009-07-20 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1108 |