NC S1337 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

UST Operator Training Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UST Operator Training Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-07-06 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-22 Ch. SL 2010-154
2010-07-22 Signed By Gov. 7/22/2010
2010-07-08 Pres. To Gov. 7/8/2010
2010-07-07 Ratified
2010-07-06 Concurred In H/com Sub
2010-07-02 Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010
2010-07-02 Rec To Concur H Com Sub
2010-07-02 Rec From House
2010-07-01 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-07-01 Amend Adopted 3
2010-06-30 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-06-30 Amend Adopted 2
2010-06-30 Amend Adopted 1
2010-06-29 Postponed To 6/30/2010
2010-06-28 Postponed To 6/29/2010
2010-06-24 Placed On Cal For 6/28/2010
2010-06-24 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2010-06-24 Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
2010-06-10 Re-ref Com On Environment and Natural Resources
2010-06-10 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-06-08 Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources
2010-06-08 Passed 1st Reading
2010-06-03 Passed 3rd Reading
2010-06-02 Passed 2nd Reading
2010-06-01 Com Substitute Adopted
2010-06-01 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2010-05-20 Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
2010-05-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H1760 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Environment and Natural Resources

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S1337&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1337v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1337v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1337v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1337v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1337v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1337v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1337v6.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2009/Bills/Senate/HTML/S1337v7.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1255
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1271
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2009&sChamber=S&RCS=1479

Bill Comments

feedback