NC S1454 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Ch. Res 2010-20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Ch. Res 2010-20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Betty Wiser
Title
Honor Betty Wiser
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Queen [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Ch. Res 2010-20 | |
2010-06-29 | Ratified | |
2010-06-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-28 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2010-06-28 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2010 | |
2010-06-22 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-16 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-15 | Filed |